IL HB0192 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Firearm Violence Prevention and Reduction Study Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to conduct a study on methods to prevent and reduce firearm violence in Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health must file a yearly report of the study's findings with the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2022 and on or before December 31 of each year thereafter through December 31, 2031. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the study is to be provided sufficient funding in the amount of $150,000 per year. Allows the Department to adopt rules necessary for the implementation and administration of the Act. Provides that the Act is repealed on January 1, 2032. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM VIOLENCE PREVENTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | To Executive- Firearms |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-008-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |