IL HB0186 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a peace officer shall not stop any person in a public place based upon an officer's inference from the circumstances that the person is committing, is about to commit, or has committed an offense as defined in the Code. Eliminates a provision requiring an officer to provide the person with a stop receipt that provides the reason for the stop and contains the officer's name and badge number. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM PRO-QUESTION W/O ARREST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Tabled |
2019-04-03 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-02-19 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 107-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 107-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 108-1.01 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=186&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0186.htm |