IL HB0185 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 11 @ 3:30 pm in Room Virtual Room 3 www.ilga.gov
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Eminent Domain Act. Provides that quick-take proceedings may be used for a period of no more than 2 years after the effective date by the City of Woodstock for the acquisition of certain described property for the purpose of widening the right-of-way proximate to the intersection of Madison Street, South Street, and Lake Avenue to construct a traffic roundabout. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

QUICK-TAKE:WOODSTOCK

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-004-000
2021-04-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-12HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris
2021-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-17HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7353025-5-80New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback