IL HB0185 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-29HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0572
2017-12-29HouseEffective Date December 29, 2017
2017-12-29HouseGovernor Approved
2017-12-07HouseSent to the Governor
2017-11-08HousePassed Both Houses
2017-11-08SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-11-08Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 8, 2017
2017-11-07SenateSecond Reading
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-11-07SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-11-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-11-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-11-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-11-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-11-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-11-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-11-01SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-11-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-11-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-11-01SenateArrive in Senate
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-10-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-012-005
2017-10-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-10-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 007-002-000
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-10-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-10-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-17HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-10-17HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback