IL HB0182 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Isolated Confinement Restriction Act. Provides that a committed person may not be placed in isolated confinement for more than 10 consecutive days. Provides that a committed person may not be placed in isolated confinement for more than 10 days in any 180-day period. Provides that while out of cell, committed persons may have access to activities, including, but not limited, to: job assignments, educational classes, vocational classes, meals, recreation, yard or gymnasium, day room, medical appointments, visits, and group therapy. Provides exceptions. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall post on the Department's official website quarterly reports on the use of isolated confinement. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2020, except some provisions are effective immediately.
Title
ISOLATED CONFINEMENT
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] |
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-8-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=182&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0182.htm |