IL HB0182 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that funds for township and road districts may be derived from other road district sources, but may not exceed the amount that would be allocated under the motor fuel tax fund formula.
Title
ROAD DISTRICT-SUBDIVISION ROAD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0171 |
2015-07-29 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 020-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-02-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-02-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 6-701.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |