IL HB0175 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that a request for review may be filed not later than 60 days after the discovery of an alleged violation of the Act (instead of 60 days after the alleged violation) if facts concerning the violation are not discovered within 60 days after the alleged violation but are discovered at a later date by a person utilizing reasonable diligence. Effective immediately.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS-REVIEW
Sponsors
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Sen. Dan Duffy [R] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0402 |
2015-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2015 |
2015-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2015-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Duffy |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Duffy |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Duffy |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 28, 2015 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive; from the Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2015-04-23 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2015-03-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-02-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-02-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |