IL HB0173 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning construction of the Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC AID-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-15HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0501
2017-09-15HouseEffective Date June 1, 2018
2017-09-15HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-28HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-28HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-001-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30551-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=173&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0173.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0173eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0173enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0501.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0173ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0173ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0173sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0173_04282017_067000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB0173_05262017_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0173_06282017_002000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback