IL HB0171 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Officer Simultaneous Tenure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 63 N: 48 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseTotal Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
2018-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2018-01-12HouseGovernor Vetoed
2017-12-07HouseSent to the Governor
2017-11-08HousePassed Both Houses
2017-11-08HouseHouse Concurs
2017-11-08HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 063-048-001
2017-11-08HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 004-003-000
2017-11-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-11-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-11-07HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-11-07HouseArrived in House
2017-11-07SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-003-003
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T.Cullerton
2017-11-07SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 7, 2017
2017-11-07SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-06-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 30, 2017
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading June 30, 2017
2017-06-29SenateSecond Reading
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-06-29SenateDo Pass Executive; 012-002-000
2017-06-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-06-29SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-06-29SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-06-29SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-06-29SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As June 30, 2017
2017-06-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-06-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-06-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-06-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-06-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-28HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 061-045-000
2017-06-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-06-28HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-06-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-06-28HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-06-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 007-002-001
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-06-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-06-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=171&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0171.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0171eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0171enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0171gms.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0171ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0171ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0171sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0171_06282017_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB0171_11072017_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0171sam001_11082017_003000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback