IL HB0166 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that on and after January 1, 2020, electronic benefits transfer ("LINK") cards used to obtain Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits or cash shall contain the name and photo of the primary cardholder and, at the option of the primary cardholder, the names of secondary holders who are authorized to use the card. Establishes that an individual may use the LINK card only if the photo on the card matches the user or he or she presents a current and valid photo identification that confirms he or she is a secondary user listed on the card. Provides that on the effective date of the amendatory Act the Department of Human Services shall begin the process of transitioning to the use of LINK cards which contain the name and photo of the primary cardholder and list the names of all authorized users of the card. Requires the transition to be completed no later than January 1, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-LINK CARD-PHOTO ID

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-02-06HouseTo Public Benefits Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-14HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.4aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback