IL HB0166 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning prohibited transactions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC EMPLOYEE BENEFITS-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HousePassed Both Houses
2018-11-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-001-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018
2018-11-27SenateSecond Reading
2018-11-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-11-27SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2018-11-20SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-11-15SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-11-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-11-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-11-14SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-11-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-11-14SenateArrive in Senate
2018-11-14HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2018-11-14House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-11-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-11-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-11-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-110Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback