IL HB0166 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2010, each school bus that is purchased new shall be equipped with seat safety belts for each passenger. Provides that the State Board of Education shall adopt rules to ensure that school districts require all passengers on those buses to wear seat safety belts. Provides that except for willful and wanton conduct, a school bus driver may not be held personally liable for the failure of passengers to wear seat safety belts. Denies home rule powers. Makes a corresponding change in the Illinois Municipal Code. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-SEAT BELTS-SCHOOL BUS
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Coulson [R] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-20 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-05 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-02-05 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2009-01-13 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=166&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0166.htm |