IL HB0165 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that any member of the General Assembly who takes office on or after the effective date of this amendatory Act shall not, within a 2-year period immediately following termination of the member's most recent term of office, register as a lobbyist and engage in lobbying with members of the General Assembly. Effective immediately.
Title
ETHICS-GA MEMBER LOBBYING
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] |
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-08 | House | To Constitutional Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=165&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0165.htm |