IL HB0164 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC EMPLOYEE BENEFITS-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-004-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-001-000
2017-05-02SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-026-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-003-000
2017-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-23HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-101.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback