IL HB0163 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that the information required to be transmitted under the prescription monitoring program must be transmitted not later than the end of the business day on which a controlled substance is dispensed, or at such other time as may be required by the Department of Human Services by administrative rule (rather than, at the end of the next business day on which the controlled substance is dispensed).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRESCRIPTION MONITORING REPORT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-15SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-08SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-14HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-13HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-12HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720570316Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback