IL HB0160 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a pupil shall be excused from engaging in a physical education course during a period of religious fasting if the pupil's parent or guardian notifies the school principal in writing that the pupil is participating in religious fasting. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-RELIGIOUS FASTING-P.E.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0405 |
2021-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2021 |
2021-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-12 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |