IL HB0159 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-02 - Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the earned income tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-02HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-29HouseArrived in House
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson
2017-05-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateDo Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-10SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-006-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-24HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355212Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback