IL HB0156 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school district shall make menstrual (rather than feminine) hygiene products available, at no cost to students, in each bathroom of every school building (rather than in bathrooms of school buildings). Effective immediately.
Title
EDUC-MENSTRUAL HYGIENE PRODUCT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Motion in House (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0340 |
2021-08-13 | House | Effective Date August 13, 2021 |
2021-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-017-000 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-004-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-043-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed 068-044-001 |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-20 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 005-003-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-03 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 005-003-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-01-14 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |