IL HB0156 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a tax credit for property taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-30HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30HouseArrived in House
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2018-05-29SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 29, 2018
2018-05-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-29SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-19SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-06HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-04-06HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-03HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355208Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback