IL HB0156 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a tax credit for property taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-06HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-04-06HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-03HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355208Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback