IL HB0155 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the rate of tax under the Non-Home Rule Municipal Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Non-Home Rule Municipal Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Non-Home Rule Municipal Use Tax Act may not exceed 2% (currently, 1%). Provides that the rate of tax that may be imposed for municipal operations may not exceed 1%. With respect to the Non-Home Rule Municipal Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Non-Home Rule Municipal Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Non-Home Rule Municipal Use Tax Act, provides that the term "public infrastructure" includes the acquisition, repair, and maintenance of public safety equipment. Effective immediately.
Title
NON-HOME RULE-ROT-RATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=155&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0155.htm |