IL HB0155 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a tax credit for property taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0243
2017-08-22HouseEffective Date August 22, 2017
2017-08-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 093-014-000
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-30HouseArrived in House
2017-05-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson
2017-05-30SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
2017-05-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-04-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-06SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-30HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-047-001
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-001-000
2017-03-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355208Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=155&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0155.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0155eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0155enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0243.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0155ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0155sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0155sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0155_03302017_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB0155_05302017_063000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0155_05312017_009000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback