IL HB0152 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sex Offender Community Notification Law. Provides that a sex offender's residence and place of employment shall be entered into the Statewide Sex Offender Database. Provides that the Illinois State Police must make the information contained in the Statewide Sex Offender Database searchable via a mapping system which identifies registered sex offenders living or working (rather than just living) within 5 miles of an identified address.
Title
SEX OFFENDER COMM NOTIFICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 152 | 115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=152&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0152.htm |