IL HB0152 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, any provision in a collective bargaining agreement that would limit the ability of a public employer to investigate the conduct of an employee of the public employer is declared to be against public policy and unenforceable unless the limitation is otherwise required by State or federal law. Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall adopt a procedure to bypass the requirement that a complaint must be supported by a sworn affidavit against a State Police Officer. Amends the Uniform Peace Officers' Disciplinary Act. Provides that every unit of local government with a law enforcement agency, and every law enforcement agency not part of a unit of local government, shall establish procedures to bypass the requirement that the complaint must be supported by a sworn affidavit against a sworn peace officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE DISCIPLINARY COMPLAINT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseTo Workforce Development Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20261014Amended CodeCitation Text
531520Amended CodeCitation Text
507253.8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback