IL HB0151 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced, with the following change: Provides that whether the minor's basic needs are met and the minor is of sufficient age and maturity level to avoid harm and unreasonable risk of harm shall be determined by considering specified factors in addition to any other relevant considerations.
Title
JUV CT-NEGLECTED MINOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-21.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12C-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |