IL HB0148 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301051.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback