IL HB0147 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Replaces references to CBD products with references to cannabinoid products. Defines "cannabinoid product". Removes definitions of "CBD" and "CBD product". Provides that "cannabinoid product" includes foods, and only foods, containing cannabinoids and that are not time/temperature control for safety foods, as defined in specified federal materials. Prohibits the manufacture, process, or offer for sale (rather than sale or distribution) of a cannabinoid product unless the cannabinoid product has labeling and packaging and has undergone lab testing (rather than has labeling and has undergone lab testing) that meet labeling, packaging, and minimum testing requirements pursuant to rules adopted by the Department of Agriculture. Requires the Department to develop rules for labeling, packaging, and minimum testing (rather than labeling and minimum testing) requirements of cannabinoid products. Provides that the Department shall make available to the public (rather than the Director of Agriculture or the Director's agent may publish or cause to be published) specified information. Provides that the Department of Public Health, local health departments, the Illinois State Police, local sheriff's departments, municipal police departments, the Department of Revenue, and the Department (rather than only the Department of Public Health, the Illinois State Police, and the Department of Agriculture) may inspect any business that manufactures, processes, transports, or distributes cannabinoid products in the State to ensure compliance with the Act. Removes provisions regarding criminal fines and offenses for violations of the Act. Provides that moneys in the CBD Safety Fund shall be utilized subject to appropriation. Provides that, notwithstanding any provision of the Act, the State may not regulate the safety of cannabinoid products in a way that is inconsistent with any federal law, rule, or regulation that regulates the safety of cannabinoid products and is in effect on or after the effective date of the Act. Makes other changes. Effective 180 days after becoming law.
Title
CBD SAFETY ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | To Executive- Cannabis |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-015-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |