IL HB0145 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Accountability and Performance System Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-15HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2017-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30253-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback