IL HB0145 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides for a credit against the withholding tax liability of an employer with fewer than 15 full-time employees in an amount equal to $2,000 for each employee who is moved from part-time to full-time employment status and who maintains that full-time employment status for a period of 12 consecutive calendar months. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-WITHHOLDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-02-20 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-02-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 704A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=145&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0145.htm |