IL HB0145 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning tax sale procedures, removes a requirement that bidders must personally attend the sale. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TAX-TAX SALE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-02-09 | Re-assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2009-01-12 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=145&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0145.htm |