IL HB0141 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2021, a family eligible for child care services whose income is at or below 185% of the most recent United States Department of Health and Human Services Federal Poverty Guidelines for the applicable family size shall pay a $1 monthly fee as a co-payment for child care services. Deletes a provision that: (i) requires the Department of Human Services to establish, by rule, a co-payment scale that provides for cost sharing by families that receive child care services, including parents whose only income is from assistance under this Code; and (ii) that require co-payments to be based on family income and family size and other factors as appropriate. Removes a provision that authorizes the Department to raise parent co-payments. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-CHILD CARE-CO-PAYMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-09 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 009-002-000 |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |