IL HB0141 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that persons shall not be determined ineligible for cash assistance provided under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program based upon a conviction for any drug-related felony under State or federal law.
Title
TANF-ELIGIBILITY-DRUG OFFENSE
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Derrick Smith [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 036-080-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2013-03-07 | House | (M1) Motion Moved to Previous Question - Rep. Michael Zalewski |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2013-02-27 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2013-02-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-02-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-02-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-02-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2013-02-20 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 008-007-000 |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |