IL HB0138 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Governor Transition Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the orderly transition of the office of Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-13HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback