IL HB0137 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-2)
Status: Passed on November 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-2)
Status: Passed on November 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Governor Transition Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the orderly transition of the office of Governor.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0553 |
2017-11-16 | House | Effective Date November 16, 2017 |
2017-11-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-11-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-11-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-11-07 | House | House Concurs |
2017-11-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2017-11-07 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-11-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-11-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-11-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-11-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 7, 2017 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-05-18 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-04-26 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-048-001 |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |