IL HB0136 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Governor Transition Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the orderly transition of the office of Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-003-000
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback