IL HB0135 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Director of Public Health, if a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches in Illinois, shall establish a standing order complete with the issuance of a prescription for a hormonal contraceptive in accordance with the requirements of the provisions. Provides that if the Director is not a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches in Illinois, the Medical Director of the Department of Public Health shall establish the standing order. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan to provide coverage for patient care services provided by a pharmacist. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, and the School Code. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that the definition of "practice of pharmacy" includes the dispensing of hormonal contraceptives pursuant to the standing order under provisions of the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the medical assistance program to cover patient care services provided by a pharmacist for hormonal contraceptives assessment and consultation. Effective January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CODE-BIRTH CONTROL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-03-29HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-03-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-03-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-03-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 005-003-000
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2021-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.3fAmended CodeCitation Text
2023102310-705New CodeSee Bill Text
2155356z.43New CodeSee Bill Text
225853Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5.12dNew CodeSee Bill Text
53756.11Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1069.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-4-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback