IL HB0135 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning bond.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2020-02-19 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |