IL HB0130 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-11-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-11-15SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-11-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-11-15SenateArrive in Senate
2018-11-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-11-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-001
2018-11-15House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2018-11-12HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-11-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-11-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-11-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-09HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51005-90Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback