IL HB0129 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that any natural person who, for compensation or other pecuniary interest, communicates with any unit of local government for the ultimate purpose of influencing official action of the unit of local government concerning an automated traffic law enforcement system, or any person or entity who employs or compensates another person for the purposes of such communications, shall register as a lobbyist under the Act. Specifies that the provisions do not apply to communications made to judicial bodies or administrative courts regarding the prosecution or defense of specified alleged violations. Defines "automated traffic law enforcement system".
Title
LOBBYIST REG-RED LIGHT CAMERA
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 170 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=129&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0129.htm |