IL HB0129 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-4)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-4)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires all school boards to designate the first Monday in October of each year "Bring Your Parents to School Day" to promote parental involvement and student success. Provides that on this day, a school board shall permit the parents or guardians of students to attend class with their children and meet with teachers and administrators during the school day.
Title
SCH CD-BRING PARENT TO SCH DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0304 |
2013-08-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-02-21 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 098-016-000 |
2013-02-21 | House | Motion Move to Previous Question Rep. Edward Sullivan |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2013-02-20 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2013-02-19 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2013-02-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 011-001-000 |
2013-02-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-02-05 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-02-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.48 | New Code | See Bill Text |