IL HB0128 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 107-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Jones
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-24HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51001-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=128&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0128.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0128eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0128enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0128ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0128ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0128sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0128sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0128_04262018_016000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB0128_05252018_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0128sam002_05312018_015000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback