IL HB0128 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0985
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0985
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0985 |
2018-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2018 |
2018-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 107-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Jones |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |