IL HB0127 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Low-Wage Employer Cost Recoupment Act. Directs the Department of Labor to impose a surcharge upon employers that pay employees wages that are less than the amount that would disqualify a single person from being eligible for federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits. Imposes a surcharge in an amount equal to the annual value of the amount of federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits for which a single person would be eligible multiplied by the number of employees whose wages do not disqualify a person from eligibility for federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits. Effective immediately.
Title
LOW-WAGE EMPLOYER-RECOUP COSTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | To Wage Policy & Study Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=127&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0127.htm |