IL HB0127 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Anti-Registry Program Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2019-03-25HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51851Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback