IL HB0126 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-001-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 011-003-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-003-000
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-17HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5801Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback