IL HB0123 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 35 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Unlimited Debate - Passed 069-035-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Unlimited Debate
2019-04-10HouseRemoved from Standard Debate Status
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-10HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-006-000
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-13HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5801Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback