IL HB0121 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Open Meetings Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-03-18HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51201.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback