IL HB0120 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0051
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0051
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Provides that the governing board must also allow a modification for the purpose of modesty in clothing or attire that is in accordance with his or her cultural values or modesty preferences. Removes language that provides that the request from a student to modify his or her athletic or team uniform must be approved by the governing board and the board shall reasonably accommodate the student's request. Provides instead that the student shall not be required to receive prior approval from the governing board for the modification. Provides that recognized nonpublic schools and charter schools must also allow a student athlete to modify his or her athletic or team uniform for the purpose of modesty in clothing or attire that is in accordance with the requirements of his or her religion or his or her cultural values or modesty preferences. Effective immediately.
Title
EDUCATION-MODEST SPORT UNIFORM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0051 |
2021-07-09 | House | Effective Date July 9, 2021 |
2021-07-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-003-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 103-005-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Immigration & Human Rights Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-01-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-21.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 305 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-220 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |