IL HB0113 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that an employee may overcome the rebuttable presumption that intoxication was the proximate cause of an injury by the preponderance of admissible evidence that intoxication was not the proximate cause (rather than the sole proximate cause or proximate cause) of the accidental injuries.
Title
WORKER COMP-INTOXICATION-CAUSE
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-16 | House | Motion Discharge Committee Lost |
2013-05-16 | House | Chair Rules Motion Out of Order due to denial of unanimous consent |
2013-05-16 | House | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-16 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | To Worker's Compensation Subcommittee |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=113&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB0113.htm |