IL HB0111 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Illinois Juvenile Justice Commission in its annual submission of recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly shall include recommendations regarding the inclusion of emerging adults into a developmentally appropriate justice system, reducing recidivism, and preventing deeper criminal involvement. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides in the Article concerning delinquent minors that on and after January 1, 2022, "delinquent minor" includes a minor who prior to his or her 19th birthday has violated or attempted to violate, regardless of where the act occurred, a federal law or State law, or county or municipal ordinance and the law or ordinance is classified as a misdemeanor offense. Provides that on and after January 1, 2024, "delinquent minor" includes a minor who prior to his or her 21st birthday has violated or attempted to violate, regardless of where the act occurred, a federal law or State law or county or municipal ordinance and the law or ordinance is classified as a misdemeanor offense. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply to violations or attempted violations committed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act.
Title
JUV COURT-DELINQUENT MINOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-05 | Senate | To Criminal Law- Juvenile Court |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-044-001 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 17a-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |